+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 311
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 18, 2014: HB 311 w/HA 1 Jaques Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 3, 2014: HA 1 to HB 311 Jaques (House)
June 3, 2014: HB 311 w/HA 1 Jaques Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor