+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 4 NO 4 NOT VOTING
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 310 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 1 NO 5 ABSENT
- Laid On Table in Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House and Assigned to Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor