+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor