+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 14, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor