+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 29, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 8 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor