+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 301 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 301 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor