+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 3
Passed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor