+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Reported Out of Committee (HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 297 - Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs
- Substituted by HS 1 for HB 297
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House