+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 291
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2014: HB 291 w/HA 1 B. Short Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
May 1, 2014: HA 1 to HB 291 B. Short (House)
May 1, 2014: HB 291 w/HA 1 B. Short Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor