+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 3 - Stricken
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Amendments (5)
SA 2 to HB 291
Passed
SA 1 to HB 291
Stricken
HA 3 to HB 291
Stricken
HA 2 to HB 291
Passed
HA 1 to HB 291
Passed
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor