+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 286
Passed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor