+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 2 to HB 284
Passed
HA 1 to HB 284
Stricken
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor