+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 281
Passed