+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Manufactured Housing) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 1