+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 271
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2014: HB 271 w/HA 1 D.E. Williams Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
April 1, 2014: HA 1 to HB 271 D.E. Williams (House)
April 1, 2014: HB 271 w/HA 1 D.E. Williams Passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor