+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor