+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 262 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- HS 1 for HB 262 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 262 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 262 - Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 262 - Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor