+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 260 - Stricken in House
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 260 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 3 to HB 260 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 3 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 260 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Vote
January 11, 2018: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor