+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 259 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 259 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor