+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor