+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House and assigned to Judiciary Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: HB 244 Walker Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2014: HB 244 Walker Passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor