+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 243 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20