+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 241
Passed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor