+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 238
Passed