+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 238
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 238 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 238 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On December 12, 2019 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 238
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor