+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor