+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: HB 224 Brady Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
March 20, 2014: HB 224 Brady Passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor