+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 220 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 220 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 220 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 220 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor