+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor