+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 218, and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2014: HS 1 for HB 218 Spiegelman Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 26, 2014: HS 1 for HB 218 Spiegelman Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor