+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 20 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor