+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House and assigned to House Administration Committee
- Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2013: HB 2 Schwartzkopf Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
January 17, 2013: HB 2 Schwartzkopf Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor