+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor