+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 14 On Its Merits
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor