+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 NO
- Amendment HA 7 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 6 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 5 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 4 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 3 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 190 - Stricken in House
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 5 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 3 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 6 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 4 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 8 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 7
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor