+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 190 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor