+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 18, and assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Vote
January 27, 2015: HS 1 for HB 18 Bolden Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor