+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor