+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor