+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 173 - - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 5 NO 3 ABSENT
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 173
- HS 1 for HB 173 - - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 173 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Substituted in House by HS 1 for HB 173
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 173 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House