+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 17