+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
- Suspension of Rules in House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor