+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 2 to HB 161
Passed
HA 1 to HB 161
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2014: HB 161 w/HA 1, HA 2 B. Short Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
July 1, 2014: The Motion on rules sus HB 161... Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 8
June 26, 2014: HA 1 to HB 161 B. Short (House)
June 26, 2014: HA 2 to HB 161 B. Short (House)
June 26, 2014: HB 161 w/HA 1, HA 2 B. Short Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41