+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 16 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor