+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE & TELECOMMUNICATIONS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Telecommunications Committee in Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor