+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 142 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor