+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 140 - Stricken in House
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 140 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor