+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 137 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 137 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor