+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House and assigned to Judiciary Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2014: HB 134 J. Johnson Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 2
June 26, 2013: HB 134 J. Johnson Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor