+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 134 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor